+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On May 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On March 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor