+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (59)
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/17
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Record vote
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 21, 2017 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Vote reconsidered
- Vote reconsidered
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Vote reconsidered in committee
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor