+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 21, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance
On May 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 21, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
- Read first time
On May 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On May 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On March 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor