+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Laid out in lieu of companion
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Reported engrossed
- Vote recorded in Journal
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor