+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On June 17, 2011 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/11
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
On May 21, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On May 20, 2011 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 17, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On March 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor