+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Laid out in lieu of companion
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Reported engrossed
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor