+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Technology
- Read first time
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate