+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor