+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On August 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed
On August 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed
On July 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Laid before the Senate
- Co-author authorized
On July 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On July 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On July 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Government Reform, Select
- Read first time
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate