+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (57)
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/19
- Filed without the Governor's signature
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Amended
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 19, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on5/8/2019
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Left pending in committee
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/27/2019
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor