+ − Actions (47)
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
- Withdrawn from calendar
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On April 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On March 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor