+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (86)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/13
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Reported enrolled
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- House adopts resolution for tech. correction
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
- House adopts conference committee report
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House grants request for conference committee
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
- Conference committee report filed
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate requests conference committee
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Senate refuses to concur
- Read
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment fails of adoption
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Energy Resources
- Read first time
- Received from the Senate
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor