+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor