+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (71)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Reported enrolled
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- House adopts resolution for tech. correction
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Amended
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Amended
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Amendment tabled
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Environmental Regulation
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate