+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on5/18/2021
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/26/2021
- Considered in public hearing
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/14/2021
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On November 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate