+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Record vote
- Amendment tabled
- Passed to 3rd reading
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor