+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (60)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Committee report distributed
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Remarks ordered printed
- Reported engrossed
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate