+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 20, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate