+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Received from the Senate
- Read first time
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor