+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 21, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 20, 2011 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On April 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Co-author authorized
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On March 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate