+ − Actions (47)
On June 19, 2009 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/09
- Filed without the Governor's signature
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Passed to 3rd reading
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On April 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor