+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor