+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate