+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Read first time
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor