+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment(s) offered
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Point of order
- Point of order sustained
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate