+ − Actions (42)
On May 24, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 23, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal
- Read first time
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate