+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
- Left pending in committee
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Rereferred to committee
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate