+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Economic Development
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate