+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (55)
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- See remarks for effective date
- Signed by the Governor
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Ways & Means
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate