+ − Actions (14)
On May 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Removed from local & uncontested calendar
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor