+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
- Read first time
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
- Read first time
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate