+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On June 17, 2011 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Reported enrolled
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 25, 2011 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On May 25, 2011 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 18, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 17, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 16, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Left pending in committee
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On March 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor