+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (58)
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 1/1/14
- Signed by the Governor
- Sent to the Governor
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 5, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in committee
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Co-author authorized
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Amendment(s) offered
- Passed
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Remarks ordered printed
- Reported engrossed
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate