+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Passed
- Reported engrossed
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
- Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor