+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Government Organization
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor