+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Elections
- Read first time
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On January 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor