+ − Actions (65)
On May 23, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Major State Calendar
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Considered in Calendars
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Environmental Regulation
- Read first time
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Rules suspended
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Co-author authorized
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
On April 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On January 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor