+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor