+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
- Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On January 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor