+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor