+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 21, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 19, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On May 16, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On May 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
On May 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
- Read first time
On March 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate