+ − Actions (49)
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Co-author authorized
- Laid out as postponed business
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment tabled
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Amendment(s) offered
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Postponed
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
On April 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- No action taken in committee
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate