+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- No action taken in committee
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor