+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On November 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate