+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor