+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
- Read first time
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor