+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee report distributed
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/23/2019
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor