+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Co-author authorized
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Passed
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor