+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (65)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
- Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
- Withdrawn from calendar
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 2nd time
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- No action taken in committee
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate