+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (56)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
- Three day rule suspended
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
- Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor